Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Raymond, James, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rupprecht, Michael W, against Songer, Jacob John, represented by Parme, Michael Cullen, Reaume, Gregory W., Zucker, Lawrence Si, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond A. Guadagni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited (35) |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
CMC Statement - Songer
Date: January 18, 2022notice of deposit of Jury Fees
Date: February 02, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 02, 2022Raymond.Inferno Guard CMS
Date: July 01, 2022Raymond.CMS for 10.5.22
Date: September 20, 2022Raymond.Ntc of Entry
Date: November 17, 2023Songer - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: January 18, 2023Raymond.RJN ISO MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.POS
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.SSUMF ISO MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.Proposed Order Granting MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.Dec. Mona ISO MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond. Notice of MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.MPA ISO MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.Songer Decl. ISO MSA
Date: May 11, 2023Raymond.Amended Dec. Mona w.Exhibits ISO MSA
Date: May 15, 2023Raymond.Ltr re PAJ
Date: November 10, 2023Raymond.Ltr to Clerk re Request
Date: June 16, 2023Raymond.Req to Take MSA off calendar
Date: June 23, 2023Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte
Date: July 19, 2023SAC42646.5387034.Motion_to_Compel
Date: July 18, 2023SAC42683-ntc
Date: July 19, 2023SAC42646.5387035.Proposed_Order
Date: July 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: July 19, 2023Proof of Hand Service
Date: July 21, 2023Raymond.Reply Brief
Date: July 28, 2023Raymond. PO Granting MTC
Date: August 02, 2023Raymond.Ntc of Entry of Order
Date: August 07, 2023Raymond.MIL No. 3
Date: August 10, 2023Raymond.MIL No. 1
Date: August 10, 2023Raymond.MIL No. 4
Date: August 10, 2023Raymond.MIL No. 2
Date: August 10, 2023Raymond.Def. Opp to MIL No. 3
Date: August 17, 2023Raymond.Def. Opp to MIL No. 4
Date: August 17, 2023Raymond.Def. Opp to MIL No. 5
Date: August 17, 2023Raymond. Def. Songer Trial Brief
Date: August 23, 2023Raymond.Inferno Guard Witness List
Date: August 23, 2023Defendants Statement of the Case
Date: August 26, 2023Proposed Joint Jury Instructions
Date: August 26, 2023Defendants Bench Brief re Big Trees Nursery
Date: August 29, 2023Raymond.Memo of Costs
Date: September 20, 2023Plaintiffs Motion to Tax Costs
Date: October 04, 2023Songer.Opposition to Pltf MTS
Date: October 18, 2023Songer.Decl. S. Baris
Date: October 18, 2023Songer.POS re Opposition
Date: October 18, 2023Songer.Decl. of Tony Arce
Date: October 18, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 31, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: Default (Appeal) Appellant's Failure to File Designation |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment in Favor of Defendant Jacob John Songer dba Inferno Guard | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Raymond.Ntc of Entry | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Amended Judgment |
|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Raymond.Ltr re PAJ | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to tax costs
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.