Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dancesport Real Estate Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Recine, Cara, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Song, Joon Il, against Kelly, Natalie, Slow Fox Dance Hall And Wine Bar Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonique S. Langhorne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
LA258305. RFD
Date: April 01, 202204_04_2022_Request_for_Dismissal_XCP
Date: April 04, 2022LA259666. Notice of Entry
Date: April 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | LA259666. Notice of Entry | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 04_04_2022_Request_for_Dismissal_XCP | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LA258305. RFD | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed Summons |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.