Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez Aguilar , Miriam, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Zambrano, Ronald Leonardo, against Gott'S Partners, Lp, represented by Darbinian, Azniv, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Scott R. L. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. L. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
51688Advan01e35c
Date: January 07, 202251688CaseM005d92
Date: January 07, 2022Perez Aguilar- CMS
Date: March 03, 202254264CaseM00deeb
Date: March 03, 2022Miriam Perez- NOS
Date: August 16, 2022Miriam Perez Aguilar - RFD
Date: September 21, 2022Perez Aguilar- JFees
Date: January 06, 2022Perez Aguilar- CMS
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial: Long Cause TE: 7 Days Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Mandatory Settlement
Judge: Judge, To Be Assigned |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Miriam Perez Aguilar - RFD | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Miriam Perez- NOS | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Unconditional |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Court OSC Re: Court's Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.