Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pacific Restoration Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Deixler, Pauline Minnie, against Buhman, Donald, Buhman Estate Vineyards Llc, Buhman, Suzanne Javorina, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Scott R. L. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. L. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CMC Statement Servpro v. Buhman PMD 1.10.2022
Date: January 13, 2022POS Civ-100 Buhman 41922
Date: April 20, 2022CM-110 41922 Buhman
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC/Receipt of Dismissal
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal RTF 9-19-22 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RTF Dismissal | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC/Receipt of Dismissal
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Court OSC: Receipt of Dismissal |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC/Receipt of Dismissal
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.