Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Floodman, Scott, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Todd, Kyle James, against Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Duffy'S Napa Valley Rehab, Llc, Vick, Maren, represented by Legrottaglie, Nicole A, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond A. Guadagni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
2128329_2022_11_23_Stip_Order_to_Contin_CMC
Date: November 23, 20222143827_2022_01_11_Acadi_tement_for_1_26_23_1
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Change of Address court FILED02082023
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss Re: Plaintiff's FTA Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | civ110_Request_for_Dismissal_SERVED09112023 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | cm110_Pltfs_Case_Managem_tement_FILED06282023 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.06.28 Defendants CMC Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.