Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mancia, Mario A, Mancia, Mario H, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against C.I.F California Interscholastic Federation Sac-Joaquin Section, Garrison, Mike, Sac-Joaquin Section Commissioner, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Foster, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
Category(39): Unlimited Other Judicial Review |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV-02884 Mario Mancia vs C.I.F. California Interscholastic Federation San Jacquin Section Order of Examination-Brittany Wilson Appearance Required. Appear to address why the matter should not be dis... | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: TBA, Judge |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Exparte Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex-Parte Application | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.