Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fonseca, Miriam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farias, Jaime G., Rosenberg, Esq, Lance, against Kishi Brothers Farms, Inc., Rosas, Rodolfo Soto, represented by Satran, Jerome Esq., Werner, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts Superior with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
Category(22): Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
November 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Readiness Conference
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.