Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gotopremiumfinance.Com, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Haines, Todd F, against Rodriguez, Rafael, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
Category(06): Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
May 16, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV-00758 Gotopremiumfinance.com v. Rafael Rodriguez Case Management Conference Appearance Required. Remote appearances are encouraged. Parties who wish to appear remotely should contact the clerk of... | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
October 04, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV-00758 Gotopremiumfinance.com v. Rafael Rodriguez Case Management Conference As a result of the reduction in court services due to the COVID-19 pandemic, there is currently a backlog of criminal t... | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
511-3 Request Entry of Default |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Inclusion of CMC | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons - Filed | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.