Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Mental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) case against Rocha, Juan Carlos, represented by Vinluan, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with John S. Salazar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Salazar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryMental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) |
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Salazar, John |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Salazar, John |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Assessment and Evaluation Report | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Form Filed | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Under Supervision | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Finds Defendant Mentally Incompetent PC1370.01(a)(1) | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Issued | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Salazar, John |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.