Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Mental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) case against Wood, Kelly, represented by Ziebron, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Paul P. Burdick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul P. Burdick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryMental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Issued | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Assessment and Evaluation Report | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Finds Defendant Mentally Incompetent PC1370.01(a)(1) | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Issued | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Firearms Restriction | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Under Supervision | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Form Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.