Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Roland, Tracy Marie, against Rodriguez, Luis Bernardo, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 16, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 07, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: June 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Moranda, David |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Envelope Monthly Payment Plan Setup with $45 Fee |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Relinquishment Packet | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Bond Exonerated
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified by Clerk of the Court | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.