Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Roland, Tracy Marie, against Romero, Isaac Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 16, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 23, 2021Doctor Report: PC1368
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Progress Report
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof: Enrollment | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Foster, David |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Collection Statement Court Collections Statement Letter |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Report/Evaluation | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Moranda, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.