Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Owens, Alan Robert, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Hansen, Ronald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHansen, Ronald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: April 07, 2021Release Order
Date: April 12, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 19, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 14, 2021Preliminary Examination
Date: May 24, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 26, 2021Order
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation is revoked
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Probation Violation | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Collection Statement Court Collections Statement Letter |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Collections Order of Referral for Payment | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.