Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Enero, Natalia Ruth, Pfeiff, Thomas M, against Medel, Marcus, represented by Foster, Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Further Proceedings
Date: April 07, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: April 20, 2021Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Readiness Conference
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Trial Setting Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Readiness Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Readiness Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.