Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Enero, Natalia Ruth, Heil, Austin Brooke, against Lorenzo, Marcelino, represented by Andrade, Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: April 02, 2021Preliminary Examination
Date: May 10, 2021Preliminary Examination
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Preliminary
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Bail Review Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Amended
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Report | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Slocum, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.