Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Heil, Austin Brooke, Her, Lee, against Moyer, Charles Steven, represented by Andrade, Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: April 02, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 12, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Firearms Relinquishment Hearing Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Relinquishment Packet | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified by Clerk of the Court | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Trial by Jury Waived | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.