Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Enero, Natalia Ruth, against Velazquezrojas, Jose Maria, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 07, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 30, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: June 18, 2021Preliminary Examination
Date: September 10, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Preliminary
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Breen, Thomas P. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Preliminary
Judge: Breen, Thomas P. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Moranda, David |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Booking Sheet | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Moranda, David |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.