Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Lewis, Kimberly R. H., against Mendez, Denise Jaqueline, represented by Carasso, Alexander Louis, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Kirihara, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKirihara, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint
Date: April 06, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: June 21, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CR Criminal Courtesy Notice Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Police Report/Incident Report | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.