Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Colby, Travis, Compton, Misty, against Hernadezromero, Ignacio Alejandro, represented by Coughlin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: March 29, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 01, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Criminal Protective
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Schechter, Jeanne |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order (Amended03/30/2021) Arraignment: Complaint - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Criminal Protective
Judge: Lo, Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.