Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Silveira, Nicole A., against Flores, Fawn, represented by Johnson, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: April 06, 2021Order
Date: March 26, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Preliminary
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bond Reinstatement and Fee Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.