Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Nored, Thane, against Lara, Fidel Nocelo, represented by Andrade, Vincent, Lamas, Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Release Order
Date: March 24, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Progress Report
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Foster, David |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Progress Report | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified by Clerk of the Court | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.