Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Min, Thomas K, against Mcnary, Derek Anthony, represented by Andrade, Vincent, Mclean, Todd Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Ash, Carol presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAsh, Carol Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: March 23, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 09, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Preliminary Examination Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Ash, Carol |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.