Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Enero, Natalia Ruth, against Moya, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 29, 2021Readiness Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Jury Trial
Date: April 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant - Video Judge: Foley, Robert |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Foley, Robert |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Firearms Relinquishment Hearing Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof
Judge: Kirihara, John |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.