Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Asdorian, Blake M, Colacito, Anthony Michael, Compton, Misty, against Santos, Francis Mienes Eliseo, represented by Coughlin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 18, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 05, 2021Arraignment: Information
Date: April 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Order
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370 Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Evaluation Request | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Doctor Report: PC1368 Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Doctor Report: PC1368 Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Doctor Report: PC1368 Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.