Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Creeger, Matthew L, against Johnson, Jamaira Markease, represented by Foster, Doug C, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 17, 2021Release Order
Date: March 17, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Hashimoto, Roy |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Hashimoto, Roy |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Hollman, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.