Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Colacito, Anthony Michael, against Durancisneros, Israel, represented by Coughlin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 18, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 25, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Sentencing Hearing Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Credit/Fines
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Criminal Protective
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.