Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Compton, Misty, against Vang, Cher, represented by Andrade, Vincent, Mclean, Todd Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shaver, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShaver, Donald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: March 09, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: March 18, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: March 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment: Complaint
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order (Amended) Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Foley, Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.