Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Margain, Andre Carlos, against Whitaker, Mark Henry, Senior, represented by Boortz, Kimberly Ann, Reed, Katharine, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Ash, Carol presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAsh, Carol Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Trial Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: July 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CR Criminal Courtesy Notice Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Police Report/Incident Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.