Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chavez, Tommy Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Robert S. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Prefiling |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prefile Arraignment / Continued Arraignment
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prefile Arraignment / Continued Arraignment
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prefile Arraignment / Continued Arraignment
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation - Prefile |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.