Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Two Elk, Steven, represented by Ramirez, Jared Ross, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference and Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.