Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reyes, Ana Lizbeth, represented by Navarrete, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference and Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference and Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.