Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Upkins, Anthony Bernard, represented by Rodriguez, Ismael, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Robert S. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.