Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Leyva, Garrett Ray, represented by Nushwat, Jamil, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Hollman, James W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHollman, James W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryFelony: Homicide |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Dougherty, Frank |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Dougherty, Frank |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.