Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Calderon, Salvador, represented by Jenkins, Shani Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Randy L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy L. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
For Information Purposes Only - Trailing Other Proceedings
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
For Information Purposes Only - Trailing Other Proceedings
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Modification of Pretrial Release Monitoring (VPRAI)
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Pretrial Release Report and Recommendation (VPRAI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.