Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ambriz, Daniel Gamboa, represented by Lee, Tonya S, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Tarter, Donna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTarter, Donna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order requiring Defendant to submit to DNA profiling | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation Sentencing
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript (Type: Entry of Plea) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | (Non-Compliant) - Probation Officer's Firearm Relinquishment | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.