Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Muniz, Julia Valenzuela, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with James LaPorte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames LaPorte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Issuance of :
Judge: LaPorte, James T. |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned (Upon Service) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Hollman, James W. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.