Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez, Eli David, represented by Harbottle, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Issuance of :
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned (Upon Service) | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance Agreement and Conditions of Release |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.