Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Weeks, James Edwards, represented by Lee, Tonya S, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Released from custody, as to this case only | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript (Type: Entry of Plea) | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.