Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carrillo, Felix Montes, represented by Navarrete, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with James W. Hollman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Hollman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Hollman, James W. |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: LaPorte, James T. |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference and Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Investigator Fees - Granted | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Investigator | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Arraignment and Appointment of Counsel
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.