Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Vieira, Kaitlyn Rose, Viera, Kaitlyn Rose, represented by Kaelble, Ralph F., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with James LaPorte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames LaPorte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference re: Violation of Probation
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference re: Violation of Probation
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference re: Violation of Probation
Judge: LaPorte, James T. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Collections update sent to GC Services | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.