Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garcia, Daniel Sandoval, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Issuance of :
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned (Upon Service) | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.