Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rodriguez, Richard John, represented by Boggs, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Valerie R. Chrissakis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValerie R. Chrissakis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.