Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fresno County Public Guardian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Estate Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court First and Final Account and Report of Conservator and Petition for Allowance of Compensation to Conservator and Attorney Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hrg: 1/31/2023 Time: 9:00a.m. Dept: 303 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hrg: 1/31/2023 Time: 9:00a.m. Dept: 303 |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 1/31/23 Time: 9am Dept: 303 |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Accounting First and Final Account and Report of Conservator and Petition for Allowance of Compensation to Conservator and Attorney Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Bank Statement(s) Bank Statements |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance. Notice of Remote Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.