Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Coleman, Ezelle, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the First or Final Distribution
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate Petition for Letters of Administration, Authorization to Administer under The IAEA Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Calendar Setting and Zoom Meeting Instructions | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Declaration of Publication |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities (Estates) | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate (Initial) Petition for Letters of Administration, Authorization to Administer under The IAEA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.