Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ramos, Guillermina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ramos, Juan Donicio, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Amy K. Guerra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy K. Guerra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing 03/19/2021 Minute order and DV-116 was mailed to the petitioner |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 03/19/2021 Reissued Hearing to: 05/07/2021 |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Guerra minute order. See attached. Dept: 204 Judge: A. Guerra Clerk: M. Rivera Reporter: M. Kazarian Petitioner: Present/Pro per-Crtroom Respondent: Not Present Court Spanish Interpreter: Alessandra Luisi for the Petitoner Hearing type: OSC Hrg w/o TRO The Court finds Alessandra Luisi is a certified/registered interpreter employed with the Superior Court of California, County of Fresno. The interpreter's certification/registration number and oath are on file with the Court. There is no proper proof of service in the Court's file. Court will reissue the Temporary Restraining Order 45-60 days out. A new Court date was obtained from the Clerk's Office today and must be served within (5) days of the new date that is given. A copy of the original Temporary Restraining Order along with the Request and Order to Continue Hearing Orders must be served timely. No temporary restraining orders were granted in this case. Today's minute order will be mailed to filing party at the address provided to the deputy. |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Denied Domestic Violence w/ zoom |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Application and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.