Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Guthery, Edward, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guthery, Bianca Alyce, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Irene A. Luna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIrene A. Luna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial OSC/Motion CS, SS, AF set by Mary Acosta Judge: Luna, Irene |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement Filed | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Mary Ayala Re: Attorneys Fees & Costs |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement Filed | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial OSC/Motion - Re: Child Support & Spousal Support hrg 3/14/22 @ 2 PM in dept 204 |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.