Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvarado, Javier G, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Meza, Jennifer S, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Amy K. Guerra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy K. Guerra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed &DV-116 |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Guerra minute order. See attached. Dept: 204 Judge: A. Guerra Clerk: M. Rivera Reporter: M. Kazarian Petitioner: Present/Pro per-Crtroom Respondent: Not Present Hearing type: OSC Hrg w/o TRO There is no proper proof of service in the Court's file. Court will reissue the Temporary Restraining Order 45-60 days out. A new Court date was obtained from the Clerk's Office today and must be served within (5) days of the new date that is given. A copy of the original Temporary Restraining Order along with the Request and Order to Continue Hearing Orders must be served timely. No temporary restraining orders were granted in this case. Today's minute order will be emailed to filing party |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 03/19/2021 Reissued Hearing to: 05/07/2021 |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Denied Domestic Violence w/ zoom |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application and Declaration for Order DV - w/ Minor Children Accepted, pending Judge's review - DV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.