Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gomez, Carlee Leeza, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gonzalez, Abel, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCullers, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryE-Filing: Petition - Harrassment (With Violence) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 11/8/2021 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of FW-003 - Order on Court Fee Waiver Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed by Clerk |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Hearing |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for orders to stop Harassment filed | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature *Pending Hearing* Order After Hearing |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.