Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Public Employment Relations Board, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case against Clovis Unified School District, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 2-4 Days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Intervene Michael Plank Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Preliminary Injunction Kimberly Procida Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Preliminary Injunction Kimberly Procida Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
February 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Public Employment Relations Board v. Clovis Unified School District Superior Court Case No. 21CECG02548 Hearing Date: February 10, 2022 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Petitioner Public Employment Relation... | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/7/22 Objection ~ Hearing 2/10/22 Objection filed CUSD's Objection to ACE's Additional Six (6) Page Reply Memorandum Re: Evidentiary Objections |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/7/22 Objection ~ Hearing 2/10/22 Objection filed CUSD's Objection to PERB's Additional Five Page Memorandum RE: Evidentiary Objections |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.