Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hernandez, Janet, Rodriguez, Enrique, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Asociados Navarro Inc., Navarro, Maria Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
Category25 Unlimited - Professional Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Attachment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
5-25-2022 Order Granted Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment Order Granted Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5/24/22 Proposed Order ~ Hearing 5/24/22 Order Received for Signature ~ Pending Ex Parte Hearing ~ |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5/24/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 5/24/22 Declaration Filed Yesenia Mendoza |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5-24-2022 Minute Order Attachment Minute Order Attachment |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5/24/22 Ex Parte Application ~ Hearing 5/24/22 Ex parte Filed Hearing 5/24/22 ~ Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5/24/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 5/24/22 Declaration Filed Amy Lovegren-Tipton |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
5/24/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 5/24/22 Declaration Filed Enrique Rodriguez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.